Financial history THE NIKAEAN ECUMENICAL TRUST

Charity number: 1015755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £15.35k £14.36k £16.63k £15.03k £18.52k
Total expenditure £4.57k £9.08k £3.00k £5.53k £53
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A