Financial history GUILD INITIATIVE FOR FURNITURE TRUST

Charity number: 1015952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £112.84k £143.72k £173.62k £205.35k £211.21k
Total expenditure £112.19k £143.84k £161.92k £149.32k £185.11k
Income from government contracts £38.64k £45.81k £68.16k £31.41k £142.89k
Income from government grants £10.83k £10.00k £10.00k £41.81k £14.85k