Governing document NOVEMBER CLUB
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/05/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THE DRAMATIC ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.