PTA - ST BLASIUS SHANKLIN CE PRIMARY ACADEMY

Charity number: 1016618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.87k £4.22k £3.10k £1.56k £2.80k
Total expenditure £3.61k £1.35k £2.00k £3.42k £2.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A