Accounts and annual returns 8TH MIRFIELD (ST MARYS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1016822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2021 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required