Governing document LEICESTER AND COUNTY CONVALESCENT HOMES SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 OCTOBER 1905 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14 JUNE 1948, 16 AUGUST 1948 AND 12 DECEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES OR ASSISTANCE TO PROMOTE BETTER HEALTH AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS WITH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, BY GRANT OR OTHERWISE, TO INCLUDE, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING , SUPPORTING CONVALESCENCE AND RESIDENTIAL AND/OR NURSING CARE BY GRANT OR OTHERWISE. ALL GRANTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES OF THE SOCIETY TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ALL RESPECTS WITHIN SUCH OBJECTS ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND TO BE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS DEFINED IN THE CHARITIES ACT 2011 FOR PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE CITY OF LEICESTER AND THE COUNTIES OF LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.