Trustees STEEPLE ASHTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1018174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Hunt | Chair | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Culverhouse | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Wright | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Betty Horrox | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Avril Lye | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marian Little | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hodges | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Wilson | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALARIE LATCH | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALISON EVANS | Trustee | 13 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.