Trustees 1ST COMBS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1018301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil Lennon Chair 22 June 2022
None on record
Ivan Keith Deakin Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Zoe Hyde Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Christopher Frost Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
Lesley Anne Frost Trustee 01 March 2016
None on record
MR D JAMESON Trustee
STOWMARKET DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
MRS A OTERO Trustee
None on record
MRS H JAMESON Trustee
None on record