Trustees FIRST HELSBY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1018532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Tiplady | Chair | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jocelyn Ellams | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ellams | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Foulkes | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Milton | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dilley | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Chalmers | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Berrie | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
David King | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN THOMAS | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
James Bainbridge | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Doran | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH POTTS | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.