Trustees Association of Christians in Counselling and Linked Professions
Charity number: 1018559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MONCKTON-RICKETT | Chair | 01 January 2011 |
|
|||||||
Leroy Harley | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Hastings | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Sean Charlesworth | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Christine Pinder | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Gathoni Hamilton-Foster | Trustee | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Mark Martin | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John Roberts | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Wien Fung | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Christopher Ross James Williams | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Anthony Victor Ruddle | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.