WELLINGTON COTTAGE CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1019200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £325.92k £319.33k £109.25k £144 £0
Total expenditure £297.49k £303.77k £337.02k £80.68k £899
Income from government contracts £108.80k £241.70k £45.85k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A