Financial history ST BENEDICT'S HOSPICE, SUNDERLAND

Charity number: 1019410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £654.85k £1.54m £1.43m £1.40m £2.30m
Total expenditure £660.88k £1.72m £1.86m £778.03k £1.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £225.00k N/A £309.26k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £482.15k £589.93k £488.90k £862.21k £1.44m
Income - Other trading activities £89.05k £0 £805.18k £325.34k £760.80k
Income - Charitable activities £55.71k £903.91k £108.07k £90.55k £84.06k
Income - Endowments £7.20k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27.93k £36.44k £28.85k £24.73k £14.83k
Income - Other £0 £12.50k £0 £92.68k £1.77k
Income - Legacies £44.76k £170.01k £168.51k £277.32k £212.59k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £467.84k £1.46m £1.06m £154.17k £301.76k
Expenditure - Raising funds £193.04k £259.65k £333.04k £188.37k £753.46k
Expenditure - Governance £3.35k £2.16k £14.80k £4.20k £5.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.17k £0 £3.82k £2.47k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £461.73k £435.49k £0