Financial history MANOR FARM WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1019706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.63k £2.18k £1.79k £1.36k £122
Total expenditure £2.37k £2.78k £1.68k £1.49k £525
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A