Trustees THORALBY AND DISTRICT VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1020089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY JEAN BURTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christine Margaret Tuer | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Cooper | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Styles | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Averil Ann McGreggor | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP JOHN STYLES | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH FAWCETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY BURTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES DODD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA MARY COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN STANLEY BROOK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.