Trustees 11TH SOUTHGATE CHRISTCHURCH COCKFOSTERS SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1020756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Emily Ann Louise Thompson | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Mark Inman | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Houghton-Hardy | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mungo Knott | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA ELIZABETH HUNTER | Trustee | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Elizabeth Palfeman | Trustee | 01 September 2005 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAFISA ASHING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.