PRISONS WEEK

Charity number: 1020920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 February 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 February 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required