Trustees STAFFORDSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1021182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ELIZABETH ANNE BIRCH Chair 26 July 2017
None on record
Alex Marie Bromley Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
Nicholas Moss Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
Nicholas John Cunliffe Trustee 04 October 2022
None on record
Richard Williams Trustee 17 September 2020
THE KING GEORGE V MEMORIAL SCOUTS AND GUIDES RECREATION LANDS
Received: On time
Shay George Norman Trustee 17 September 2020
KIBBLESTONE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
59TH NEWCHAPEL SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
CLIVE LEADER Trustee 14 September 2017
KIBBLESTONE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Joanne Gilbert Trustee 21 November 2016
None on record
Esther Marie Bromley Trustee 14 September 2016
None on record
BRUCE MATTHEW FIELD Trustee
None on record