Accounts and annual returns ST JOHNS KIDS CLUB

Charity number: 1022665
Charity reporting is overdue by 1824 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 363 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 363 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 728 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 728 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1093 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1093 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1458 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1458 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1824 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1824 days