THE A1 STEAM LOCOMOTIVE TRUST

Charity number: 1022834
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £955.70k £1.41m £1.86m £1.51m £2.01m
Total expenditure £948.53k £1.03m £1.51m £1.23m £1.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £553.46k £692.25k £792.29k £414.79k £1.13m
Income - Other trading activities £27.34k £38.86k £57.43k £697.62k £880.89k
Income - Charitable activities £374.82k £661.47k £1.01m £394.13k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £80 £0 £0 £55 £338
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £254.58k £380.25k £435.07k £25.99k £472.34k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £147.60k £265.03k £341.53k £376.95k £387.27k
Expenditure - Raising funds £800.92k £761.48k £1.17m £854.13k £1.01m
Expenditure - Governance £3.50k £3.50k £3.50k £6.09k £3.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0