Financial history FRIENDS OF BRANCASTER CHURCH

Charity number: 1023364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.29k £8.34k £5.97k £6.91k £5.19k
Total expenditure £2.00k £16.01k £4.63k £30.19k £753
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A