Financial history HASTINGS CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1024041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £57.88k £61.02k £41.94k £53.88k £37.64k
Total expenditure £52.86k £58.65k £56.91k £32.00k £36.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £16.81k £4.36k