26TH CITY OF STOKE ON TRENT ST GREGORYS SCOUTS

Charity number: 1024474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.68k £4.46k £5.64k £2.71k £9.13k
Total expenditure £3.47k £4.18k £5.54k £3.97k £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A