Trustees BERLIN INFANTRY BRIGADE MEMORIAL TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1024549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIGADIER MEEK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Major General Charles Seymour Collins DSO Obe | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Angela Marie Laycock | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Daryl Robert Murphy RE | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Major Sugdon | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Major Rimmer | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Smith | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR ROSENHEAD | Trustee | 19 June 1993 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.