ARCH INITIATIVES

Charity number: 1024945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.23m £6.53m £4.90m £2.94m £9.89m
Total expenditure £5.92m £6.92m £4.73m £2.65m £9.94m
Income from government contracts £2.84m £5.45m £4.80m £2.47m £9.28m
Income from government grants £10.99k £0 N/A N/A £191.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £178.00k £30 £95 £0 £192.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £65.58k £16.86k £6 £83.04k
Income - Charitable activities £3.92m £6.34m £4.80m £2.47m £9.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £134.00k £124.85k £84.09k £164.65k £266.02k
Income - Other £35 £0 £0 £302.69k £67.68k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.53m £6.92m £4.39m £2.65m £9.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £339.70k £0 £51.62k
Expenditure - Governance £6.00k £0 £4.80k £0 £2.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £339.70k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £389.11k £0 £0 £0 £19.75k