Financial history SWALLOWFIELD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £62.16k £58.87k £74.01k £71.18k £77.98k
Total expenditure £58.74k £58.83k £62.41k £68.58k £75.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £35.45k £49.00k £54.82k £56.58k