Trustees LEASOWE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1025254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH COULTHARD | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MIRIAM LONG | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANN BURTON | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARY COOIL | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ada Lewis | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Ann Barr | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Barbara Black | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheelagh Dobby | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL APPERLEY | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy May Harding | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christiane Ambler | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Karen Quayle | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
NORMA EVE SCREGG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.