Trustees LITTLE FLYERS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1025728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Conway | Chair | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Andrews | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hayter | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Symons | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Cornford | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cornford | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Kimber | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tom Kimber | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Rickman | Trustee | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.