Accounts and annual returns POPLARS STEVENAGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1025912
Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 178 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 178 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 05 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 12 March 2022 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 March 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 19 March 2021 447 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required