Financial history FAIRFIELD (CROYDON) LIMITED

Charity number: 1026483
Charity is in administration
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £5.81m £6.71m £6.81m £6.72m £6.49m
Total expenditure £6.18m £7.08m £6.70m £6.95m £6.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.54m
Income - Donations and legacies £865.19k £1.46m £1.75m £1.53m £1.64m
Income - Other trading activities £4.94m £5.25m £5.06m £1.38m £1.34m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £3.75m £3.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.94k £397 £91 £52 £71
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £65.71k £5.63k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.61m £5.18m £5.59m £5.58m £5.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £15.00k £20.41k £34.50k £39.93k £28.54k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £713.55k £698.36k