THE ATLANTIC COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1026837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.37k £12.10k £29.10k £9.95k £9.59k
Total expenditure £9.49k £11.58k £29.62k £9.09k £8.91k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A