ELRAHMA CHARITY TRUST

Charity number: 1026927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.21m £1.17m £1.24m £1.00m £947.75k
Total expenditure £761.76k £814.34k £821.77k £1.29m £874.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £250 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.21m £1.17m £1.24m £675.01k £694.55k
Income - Other £15.80m £0 £0 £329.65k £253.20k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £761.76k £814.34k £821.77k £1.29m £874.78k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £8.28k £0 £6.82k £8.61k £14.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0