Governing document HELP FOR CARERS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 AUG 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 OCT 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 OCT 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 OCT 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 JUL 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS, AND BENEFICIARIES IN ENGLAND AND WALES. BENEFICIARIES MEANS ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHO HAVE CARE NEEDS AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR AGE. CARERS MEANS ANY PERSON INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OF CARE WITHOUT RECEIVING REMUNERATION OTHER THAN STATUTORY BENEFITS, FOR A PERSON OR PEOPLE WHO HAVE CARE NEEDS AS A RESULT OF DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR AGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.