PUDDLEDUCKS COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1027069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £107.69k £102.87k £109.13k £79.60k £86.71k
Total expenditure £109.94k £102.49k £108.38k £104.54k £96.33k
Income from government contracts £70.43k £64.80k N/A £55.83k £59.35k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £8.66k