Trustees 16TH AIREDALE (YEADON METHODIST) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1027174
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Elizabeth Darnbrough | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louis Robinson | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY SMITH | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS A FIELDHOUSE | Trustee | 27 November 2009 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BENSON | Trustee | 22 April 2005 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ANN BELL | Trustee | 22 April 2005 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GIRT | Trustee | 22 April 2005 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GREENWOOD | Trustee | 21 February 1978 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE BELL Mr | Trustee | 08 April 1974 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GREENWOOD | Trustee | 14 March 1969 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE EDWARD BELL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.