Financial history ST JOHN FISHER SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1027255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2017 30/10/2018 30/10/2019 30/10/2020 30/10/2021
Total gross income £3.99k £4.27k £3.68k £421 £4.35k
Total expenditure £1.25k £5.35k £3.19k £2.16k £131
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A