DEAFINITELY INDEPENDENT

Charity number: 1027567
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £768.80k £701.05k £747.99k £746.08k £836.94k
Total expenditure £808.89k £773.17k £723.69k £649.70k £690.02k
Income from government contracts £740.78k £698.62k £706.52k £722.38k £828.28k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £804 £2.22k £16.55k £2.25k £8.03k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £256 £38 £43
Income - Charitable activities £767.75k £698.62k £731.14k £743.49k £828.28k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £248 £211 £50 £314 £594
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £793.13k £773.17k £723.69k £649.70k £690.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0