ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY FAWKHAM

Charity number: 1028026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.83k £3.78k £4.07k £3.36k £3.29k
Total expenditure £17 £4.89k £1.70k £85 £6.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A