Trustees BROOKSITE UNDER 5'S
Charity number: 1028184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Embling | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lois Dalton | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Meynell | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adele Gratton | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Gunn | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eilise Brogan | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Handley | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Savannah Reith | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Morris | Trustee | 23 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.