Financial history RUSSIAN LANGUAGE UNDERGRADUATE STUDIES LIMITED

Charity number: 1028482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £355.17k £363.82k £256.46k £303.95k £162.12k
Total expenditure £352.27k £369.27k £282.31k £321.85k £162.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A