Financial history NIDDERDALE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1028508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £1.95k £8.86k £2.09k £2.91k £7.48k
Total expenditure £1.39k £6.54k £2.02k £3.88k £6.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A