Financial history HURLEY VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1028748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.76k £11.02k £7.12k £10.61k £10.92k
Total expenditure £11.57k £13.90k £12.48k £14.25k £12.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A