BRENTWOOD AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1029125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.90k £17.52k £4.31k £1.83k £1.49k
Total expenditure £9.66k £14.45k £2.71k £3.61k £200
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A