Trustees GREAT TEW PRE SCHOOL
Charity number: 1029188
Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristina Bull | Chair | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Clare Field | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Tucker | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Edberg | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Thorp | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dave Whittaker | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Foster | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amie Salt | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Christina Cox | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wheeler | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Laura Bowden | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.