Trustees ST. JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL P.T.A.
Charity number: 1029230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsey Jayne Baldry | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Culley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Alexandra Parker | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Helen Wildon | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Jade Dean | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Chambers | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Crichton | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.