CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY CHICHESTER

Charity number: 1029527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.90k £21.10k £24.34k £28.63k £66.05k
Total expenditure £37.90k £31.50k £32.22k £22.31k £28.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A