Financial history SAINT FRANCIS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1030456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.04k £1.82k £2.83k £6.21k £3.24k
Total expenditure £1.40k £784 £1.47k £6.54k £4.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A