Trustees NEW FOREST (WATERSIDE) UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1030719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marilyn Frances Wheelband | Chair | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Campbell | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Miller | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jan Parkin | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caryll Young | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Andrews | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Dagnall | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Rob Snellgrove | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Norma Christine Martin | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS Trish Franks | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.