CHRISTIAN VISION

Charity number: 1031031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £43.93m £48.80m £32.59m £27.75m £36.77m
Total expenditure £14.41m £21.40m £19.23m £18.58m £18.33m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £26.50m £31.68m £12.76m £8.00m £19.10m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.43m £17.12m £19.83m £19.75m £17.67m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.41m £21.40m £16.27m £18.04m £18.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £1.32m £539.76k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £105.53k £87.68k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £1.32m £539.76k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £1.64m £0 £0