Trustees LITTLE EALING PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1031052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SCOTT ANTHONY WARREN ILLMAN | Chair | 27 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Jamie Fergus Crockett | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jaishree Vayavaharkar | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Webb | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Cracknell | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Wheeler | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Will Ullstein | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Smith | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rainbow | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Idairo Pardo | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Grigg | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Carter | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hammond | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laura Samuels | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Louise Lindsrom | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Naushad Ahmed | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Hodges | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Samuels | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Eftychia Linardou | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Swe Chambers | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER PAUL VINES | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.