Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BARNARD CASTLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1031370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £13.02k £7.36k £8.81k £10.49k £6.04k
Total expenditure £5.25k £9.93k £7.21k £12.26k £6.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A